United States of America v. Kramer et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Doron Kramer, Donald Kramer, Don Kramer and Oakland County Treasurer
Case Number: 2:2024cv10822
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 DOCUMENT from DORON KRAMER (LGra)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Doron Kramer served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (Caves, Daniel)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oakland County Treasurer waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Nunez, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/25/2024 (DJen). [Sent date incorrect on waiver].
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey N. Nunez on behalf of United States of America. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2024 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Oakland County Treasurer. (Caves, Daniel) Modified on 4/3/2024 (JHea)[Summons not reissued, already issued for defendant in ECF No. #3 on 4/1/2024].
April 3, 2024 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Doron Kramer. (Caves, Daniel) Modified on 4/3/2024 (JHea) [Summons not reissued, already issued for defendant in ECF No. #3 on 4/1/2024].
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Doron Kramer, Oakland County Treasurer* (JHea)
April 1, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (JHea)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Caves, Daniel)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against Doron Kramer(as defacto personal representative and/or potential heir and/or distributee of the Estate of Richard Kramer), Doron Kramer(individually), Doron Kramer(as Trustee of the Kramer Christian Trust), Oakland County Treasurer. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-CV-10818, Judge Bernard A. Friedman] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tax Court Memorandum Opinion and Order) (Caves, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kramer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doron Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel M. Caves
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?