Bagley et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bagley and Kristina Daugirdas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv10974
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Bagley, Kristina Daugirdas against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Letter)[Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
May 30, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order, #8 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Nicholas Bagley at 2301 Woodside Road, Ann Arbor, MI 48104. Address for Plaintiff Kristina Daugirdas not provided. (AChu)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (AChu)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Notice of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (Response due by 6/12/2024) Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (AChu)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (SSch)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America, US Attorney General, and US Attorney's Office* (SSch)
April 23, 2024 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 405.00 by Nicholas Bagley - Receipt No. 150010152 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 4/29/2024 (NAhm)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Bagley, Kristina Daugirdas against United States of America [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Daugirdas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?