Krzycki v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Kenneth John Krzycki Jr.
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Interested Party: (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of the General Counsel and (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2024cv11113
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ridgell-Boltz on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
May 2, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs Corrected by Kenneth John Krzycki Jr.. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Wrong document uploaded. (MarW)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 [STRICKEN] ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW) Modified on 5/2/2024 (MarW).
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wesley James Lamey appearing on behalf of Kenneth John Krzycki Jr. (Lamey, Wesley)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kenneth John Krzycki. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth John Krzycki against Commissioner of Social Security. No summons requested. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Unknown. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit civil cover) (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
April 26, 2024 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of New Case Filing to Social Security Administration's Office of the General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan. (MSyl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krzycki v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth John Krzycki Jr.
Represented By: Wesley James Lamey
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: (Court Use Only) SSA Notification - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?