FKA Distributing Co v. Highflyer214 et al
Plaintiff: FKA Distributing Co Doing business as Homedics
Defendant: Highflyer, LLC Doing business as Highflyer214, Boruch Kirschenbaum and Rivka Kirschenbaum
Case Number: 2:2024cv11320
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE by Highflyer, LLC, Highflyer214, Boruch Kirschenbaum, Rivka Kirschenbaum re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support signed Exhibit 2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Signed Declaration of RK) (Meyer, Kurt)
July 15, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Highflyer, LLC, Highflyer214, Boruch Kirschenbaum, Rivka Kirschenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Boruch Kirschenbaum, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Rivka Kirschenbaum) (Meyer, Kurt)
July 15, 2024 Filing 22 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Highflyer, LLC (Meyer, Kurt)
July 15, 2024 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kurt D. Meyer appearing on behalf of Highflyer, LLC, Highflyer214, Boruch Kirschenbaum, Rivka Kirschenbaum (Meyer, Kurt)
July 12, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FKA Distributing Co as to Shira Leiser, BRIX Fulfilment Center and Entrust Abstract LLC Without Prejudice (Cantor, Mark)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendants Martin Eisikovic and Opened Box Returns LLC. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (MNee)
July 1, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FKA Distributing Co as to Martin Eisikovic and Opened Box Returns LLC (Cantor, Mark)
June 27, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Entrust Abstract LLC served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 27, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Shira Leiser served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 21, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Opened Box Returns LLC served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 20, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Boruch Kirschenbaum served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 20, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rivka Kirschenbaum served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 20, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Highflyer, LLC served on 6/18/2024, answer due 7/9/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
June 12, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for *Entrust Abstract LLC, Highflyer, LLC, Boruch Kirschenbaum, Rivka Kirschenbaum, Shira Leiser, Opened Box Returns LLC* (JHea)
June 11, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by FKA Distributing Co against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Reg No. 2,544,528) (Cantor, Mark)
June 11, 2024 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Cantor, Mark)
May 31, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Martin Eisikovic served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BRIX Fulfilment Center served on 5/22/2024, answer due 6/12/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Highflyer214 served on 5/22/2024, answer due 6/12/2024. (Cantor, Mark)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Protocols on Filings and Communication with the Court. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (SSch)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *BRIX Fulfilment Center, Martin Eisikovic, Highflyer214* (JPar)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FKA Distributing Co., d/b/a Homedics (Cantor, Mark)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Cantor, Mark)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FKA Distributing Co., d/b/a Homedics against BRIX Fulfilment Center, Martin Eisikovic, Highflyer214 with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9797334 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trademark Registration 2,544,528) (Cantor, Mark)
May 20, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (JPar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FKA Distributing Co v. Highflyer214 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highflyer, LLC Doing business as Highflyer214
Represented By: Kurt D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boruch Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Kurt D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivka Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Kurt D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FKA Distributing Co Doing business as Homedics
Represented By: Mark A. Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?