College Democrats at the University of Michigan et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Michigan Federation of College Democrats, College Democrats at the University of Michigan and College Democrats at Michigan State University
Defendant: Sally Williams and Ruth Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv12722
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER Staying Proceedings; Vacating #19 Order; and Setting Status Conference for 1/9/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (WBar)
September 26, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 10/19/18 is Cancelled. (WBar)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats of withdrawal of #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Dul, Sambo)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for State Defendants to Respond to #12 Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/1/2018, Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (WBar)
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sambo Dul on behalf of College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats. (Dul, Sambo)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Hearing and Scheduling Deadlines for Submissions re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction :( Response due by 10/1/2018, Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 09:30 AM IN DETROIT before District Judge Robert H. Cleland)(See Order for Additional Dates). Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (WBar)
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Scheduling Conference held on 9/20/2018; Order to follow. (WBar)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration filed by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats, and Setting a., ( Scheduling Conference for 9/20/2018 01:30 PM IN PORT HURON, MI before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER DENYING #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration filed by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats. (Separate Order to be issued) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 ERRATA Sheet re: #15 Response to Motion filed by Sally Williams, Ruth Johnson. by Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Errata Sheet) (Meingast, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration filed by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - September 7, 2018 Email) (Anderson, Jacki)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration filed by Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. (Meingast, Heather)
September 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration by All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Jacki)
September 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jacki Anderson, #3 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Jonathan Rodden, #4 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Peter Levine and Prabhat Gautam, #5 Exhibit 3 - Michigan Senate, March 18, 1999 Transcript, #6 Exhibit 4 - Floor Session, Michigan House of Representatives, #7 Exhibit 5 - Driver License/Voter Address, #8 Exhibit 6 - Motor/Voter Implementation, #9 Exhibit 7 - Michigan Senate Journal, 90th Legislature, Regular Session, #10 Exhibit 8 - Michigan Opinion of the Attorney General, No. 6930, #11 Exhibit 9 - Hearing Before the Michigan House of Representatives Standing Committee on Ethics and Elections, 94th Mich. Leg. 1, #12 Exhibit 10 - Governors Remarks upon Signing SB 432 into Law, #13 Exhibit 11 - Michigans Stabenow challenges Abraham for Senate, #14 Exhibit 12 - Statement of Organization, #15 Exhibit 13 - Cook Political Report, #16 Exhibit 14 - NATIONAL JOURNALS CONGRESS DAILY, #17 Exhibit 15 - Detroit News, #18 Exhibit 16 - Fix the System, #19 Exhibit 17 - Its Strictly the Party Line in Michigan Primary, #20 Exhibit 18 - Whos Afraid of the Big Bad Vote?, #21 Exhibit 19 - West Michigan Clerks Debunk Voter Fraud Claims, #22 Exhibit 20 - Michigan is the New Illinois in Voter Fraud Myths, #23 Exhibit 21 - Michigans Machiavelli: How Congressman Rogers Stole Students Votes, #24 Exhibit 22 - MSU YouVote, #25 Exhibit 23 - Voting Tips for College Students, #26 Exhibit 24 - Voting Tips for College Students, #27 Exhibit 25 - New Law Affects College Voters, #28 Exhibit 26 - Slices of life from East Lansing elections, #29 Exhibit 27 - Letter from Carolyn L. Grawi, #30 Exhibit 28 - Letter from Marc Elias to Ruth Johnson, #31 Exhibit 29 - Clerks Cant Circumvent Voting Rules, #32 Exhibit 30 - Update: Michigans Voting Laws, #33 Exhibit 31 - Election Inspectors Procedure Manual, #34 Exhibit 32 - Project Vote, #35 Exhibit 33 - Memorandum from Jean Golden, #36 Exhibit 34 - Elections Task Force Report and Recommendations, #37 Exhibit 35 - Opinion and Order, #38 Exhibit 36 - Statement of Chris Swope, #39 Exhibit 37 - Statement from Dusty Farmer, #40 Exhibit 38 - Statement from Clerk Barb Byrum, #41 Exhibit 39 - Letter from Chief Deputy Attorney General Carol L. Isaacs to the Honorable Michael D. Bishop, #42 Exhibit 40 - Letter from Richard A. Bandstra, #43 Exhibit 41 - Letter from Christopher M. Thomas, #44 Exhibit 42 - Could Michigans restrictive student voter law hurt Bernie Sanders?, #45 Exhibit B - Declaration of Gilda Jacobs, #46 Exhibit C - Declaration of Aaron Stephens, #47 Exhibit D - Declaration of Camron Razdar, #48 Exhibit E - Declaration of Lisa Brown, #49 Exhibit F - Declaration of Mark Miller, #50 Exhibit G - Declaration of Dianne Byrum, #51 Exhibit H - Declaration of Eli Pales, #52 Exhibit I - Declaration of Kellie Lounds, #53 Exhibit J - Declaration of Norma Bailey, #54 Exhibit K - Declaration of Rebeckas Miller, #55 Exhibit L - Declaration of Robert Joerg, #56 Exhibit M - Declaration of Barb Byrum, #57 Exhibit N - Declaration of Chris Swope, #58 Exhibit O - Declaration of Dusty Farmer, #59 Exhibit P - Declaration of Kylie Novak, #60 Exhibit Q - Declaration of Larry Kestenbaum) (Anderson, Jacki)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats against Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Anderson, Jacki)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Elias on behalf of College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats. (Elias, Marc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats. (Anderson, Jacki)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams (Meingast, Heather)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Denise C. Barton appearing on behalf of Ruth Johnson, Sally Williams (Barton, Denise)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacki Lynn Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Jacki)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ruth Johnson served on 08/31/2018. (Anderson, Jacki)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sally Williams served on 08/31/2018. (Anderson, Jacki)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Allan Totten appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Totten, Mark)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Sally Williams* (LGra)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ruth Johnson* (LGra)
August 31, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by College Democrats at Michigan State University, College Democrats at the University of Michigan, Michigan Federation of College Democrats against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6885434 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Anderson, Jacki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: College Democrats at the University of Michigan et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Federation of College Democrats
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Mark Allan Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College Democrats at the University of Michigan
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Mark Allan Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College Democrats at Michigan State University
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Mark Allan Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Williams
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Denise C. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?