Winton v. First Student, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tommy Winton
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv12877
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Robert H Cleland
1 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2018. Case to be consolidated with 18-12315. Scheduling order to issue. (LWag)
October 29, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2018 03:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL) (LWag)
October 15, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Port Huron. (SSch)
September 24, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Mannino on behalf of Tommy Winton. (Mannino, Andrea)
September 24, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Gordon on behalf of Tommy Winton. (Gordon, Deborah)
September 20, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Ryder Wentz on behalf of First Student, Inc.. (Wentz, Amy)
September 14, 2018 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by First Student, Inc. (Giffen, Jaclyn)
September 14, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
September 14, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First Student, Inc.. (Giffen, Jaclyn)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Student, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 18-167620-CD. Receipt No: 0645-6904903 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern Divison, 3:18-cv-12315, Judge Robert H. Cleland] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 OCCC Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Kristy Baccile, #3 Exhibit 1 USDC Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury) (Giffen, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winton v. First Student, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn R. Giffen
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Winton
Represented By: Deborah L. Gordon
Represented By: Andrea M. Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?