Frontczak et al v. City of Detroit et al

Plaintiff: Michael Valentino and Nick Frontczak
Defendant: Larry Barnett, Reginald Beasley, Kenneth Ballnski, Stephen Geelhood, City of Detroit, Arthur Leavells, Amy Matelic, Matthew Bray, Marlon Wilson and Gregory Tourville
Case Number: 3:2018cv13781
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Defendant City of Detroit's Answerto Complant, Affirmative Defenses and Other Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand and Certicate of Service by City of Detroit. (Allen, James)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend the time for Defendant City of Detroit to file a responsive pleading, ( Response due by 1/31/2019) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 13, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey R. Johnson on behalf of City of Detroit. (Johnson, Lindsey)
December 13, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Allen on behalf of City of Detroit. (Allen, James)
December 12, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Detroit served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Dezsi, Michael)
December 7, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (ATee)
December 7, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
December 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Dettmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Dettmer, Dennis)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7017909 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): EDMICH, 15-10547, Judge Borman] (Dezsi, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontczak et al v. City of Detroit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Valentino
Represented By: Dennis A Dettmer
Represented By: Michael R. Dezsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Frontczak
Represented By: Dennis A Dettmer
Represented By: Michael R. Dezsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Ballnski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Geelhood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Detroit
Represented By: James P. Allen
Represented By: Lindsey R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Leavells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Matelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Tourville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?