State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Angelo et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: D.O. Reese J. James, Muhammad S. Awaisi, Tox Testing, Inc., Chitra Sinha, M.D., Mercyland Health Services, PLLC, Sam Hakki, M.D., US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct, Michael Angelo and Orthopedic, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv10669
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Hyder on behalf of Michael Angelo, Reese J. James, Tox Testing, Inc., US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct. (Hyder, Steven)
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Sam Hakki, M.D.. (Thomas, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Defendant Mercyland Health Services to file its response, ( Response due by 5/8/2019) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Orthopedic, P.C. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Muhammad S. Awaisi served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (O'Brien, David)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert L. Akouri appearing on behalf of Mercyland Health Services, PLLC (Akouri, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sam Hakki, M.D. served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Reese J. James waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Angelo waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; Tox Testing, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct waiver sent on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Chitra Sinha, M.D. waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 6/12/2019., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Chitra Sinha, M.D. waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 3/21/2019 (SOso). [WAIVER MAILED ON 03/14/19; ANSWER DUE WITHIN 60 DAYS] Modified on 3/21/2019 (DPer).
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mercyland Health Services, PLLC served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (O'Brien, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Wedad Ibrahim on behalf of Chitra Sinha, M.D.. (Ibrahim, Wedad)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald William Chapman, II on behalf of Chitra Sinha, M.D.. (Chapman, Ronald)
March 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cranmer, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B. Giordano on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Giordano, Caroline)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. O'Brien on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Brien, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7139204 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: McLean County, Illinois - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County - County of 1st Defendant: New Jersey. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ortho P.C. Examinations, Prescriptions, and Toxicology Testing, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mercyland Examinations, Prescriptions, and Toxicology Testing, #4 Exhibit 3 - Patient TN Records, #5 Exhibit 4 - Patient SS Records, #6 Exhibit 5 - Patient KD Records, #7 Exhibit 6 - Billing Records) (Cranmer, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Angelo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Reese J. James
Represented By: Steven M. Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad S. Awaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tox Testing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chitra Sinha, M.D.
Represented By: Wedad Ibrahim
Represented By: Ronald William Chapman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercyland Health Services, PLLC
Represented By: Robert L. Akouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Hakki, M.D.
Represented By: Sarah Marie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct
Represented By: Steven M. Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Angelo
Represented By: Steven M. Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopedic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Represented By: David D. O'Brien
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?