Elmazi v. TDK Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ferzula Elmazi
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., Hutchinson Technology Inc., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., Headway Technologies, Inc., NHK International Corporation and NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv12244
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants NHK Intl Corp, NHK Spring Co, Ltd, NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co, Ltd, NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co, Ltd., NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd and NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co, Ltd to Respond to the Complaint and Accept Service Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Hutchinson Technology, Inc, Headway Technologies, TDK Corporation, Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co, Ltd and SAE Magnetics (H.K.)Ltd to respond to complaint and accepting service (See order for details) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) Modified on 9/9/2019 (LWag).
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hollis L Salzman on behalf of Ferzula Elmazi. (Salzman, Hollis)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Salzman, Hollis)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. NHK International Corporation served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Salzman, Hollis)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hutchinson Technology Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Salzman, Hollis)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Headway Technologies, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Salzman, Hollis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ferzula Elmazi of Companion Case (Miller, E.)
July 31, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Headway Technologies, Inc., Hutchinson Technology Inc., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation* (SKra)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Ferzula Elmazi. (Almonrode, Sharon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Jury Trial Demanded filed by Ferzula Elmazi against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7344634 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Monroe County - County Where Action Arose: Monroe County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Japanese Manufacturer Agrees to Plead Guilty to Fixing Prices for Suspension Assemblies Used in Hard Disk Drives, DOJ (Jul. 29, 2019), #3 Exhibit 2 - TDK, NHK Spring raided over price collusion suspicions, MLEX (Jul. 26, 2016)., #4 Exhibit 3 - Information, United States of America v. NHK Spring Co., Ltd, 2:19-cr-20503 (E.D. Mich. Jul. 29, 2019), ECF No. 1 (NHK Information), #5 Exhibit 4 - Hutchinson contacted by DOJ in hard-disk suspension assembly investigation, Mlex (Jul. 28, 2016), #6 Exhibit 5- TDK Corporation Announces Completion of Hutchinson Acquisition, TDK Global (Oct. 6, 2016), #7 Exhibit 6 - Hutchinson Shares Extend Slide on Continued FTC Antitrust Review, THESTREET (Jan. 5, 2016), #8 Exhibit 7 - Hard Drives, EXPLAINTHATSTUFF, #9 Exhibit 8 - Hard Disk Drives, TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY, #10 Exhibit 9 - Suspension Assembly for Hard Disk Drive, Encyclopedia of Tribology, #11 Exhibit 10 - Worldwide Unit Shipments of Hard Disk Drives (HDD) from 1976 to 2022 (in millions), STATISTA, #12 Exhibit 11 - NHK Spring agrees to plead guilty to fixing prices for suspension assemblies used in hard disk drives,MLEX (Jul. 29, 2019), #13 Exhibit 12 - Robert G. Harris & Lawrence A. Sullivan, Passing on the Monopoly Overcharge: A Comprehensive Policy Analysis, 128 U. PA. L. REV. 268, 275 (1979), #14 Exhibit 13 - Order re: Class Certification at 13-14, Coordination Proceedings Special Title (Rule 1550(b)) Microsoft I-V Cases, No. J.C.C.P. No. 4106, (Cal. Sup. Ct. Aug. 29, 2000)) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmazi v. TDK Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Precision (Guangzhou) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headway Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferzula Elmazi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Hollis L Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?