Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc. et al v. NHK Spring Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Cowden Associates, Inc. and Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, NHK Spring Co. Ltd., Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., John Does 1-10, Hutchinson Technology Inc., NHK International Corporation and NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv12258
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Extension of time for Defendants Hutchinson Technology, Inc, TDK Corporation, Magnecomp Precision Technology Public co, Ltd and SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd to respond to the complaint and accept service Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants NHK Intl Corp, NHK Spring Co, Ltd, NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co, Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co, Ltd., and NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd to Respond to the Complaint and Accept Service Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Port Huron. (NAhm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Gjonaj on behalf of Cowden Associates, Inc., Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.. (Gjonaj, Diana)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Ellis on behalf of Cowden Associates, Inc., Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.. (Ellis, Tiffany)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Novak on behalf of Cowden Associates, Inc., Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.. (Novak, Paul)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Stamatopoulos on behalf of Cowden Associates, Inc., Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.. (Stamatopoulos, Gregory)
August 1, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cowden Associates, Inc., Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc. against Hutchinson Technology Inc., John Does 1-10, Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd., NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd., NHK International Corporation, NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd., NHK Spring Co. Ltd., SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd., TDK Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7346650 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cv-12244, Judge Robert H. Cleland] (Himes, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc. et al v. NHK Spring Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring (Thailand) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAE Magnetics (H.K.) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK Spring Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnecomp Precision Technology Public Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHK International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Peripheral (Dong Guan) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cowden Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Financial Services of Tampa Bay Inc.
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?