Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. OPDYKE GAS STATION INC et al
Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Defendant: NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC, HMA ENTERPRISES INC, Al-Hakim Corporation, KMA OIL INC, LENOX OIL INC, 4661 GAS & MORE INC, YG & L CORP, OPDYKE GAS STATION INC, ORION FOOD STOP INC and SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv13381
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Statement of Disclosure) (Otto, Troy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *ORION FOOD STOP INC* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *OPDYKE GAS STATION INC* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *KMA OIL INC* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *HMA ENTERPRISES INC* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Al-Hakim Corporation* (LGra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *4661 GAS & MORE INC* (LGra)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 4661 GAS & MORE INC, Al-Hakim Corporation, HMA ENTERPRISES INC, KMA OIL INC, NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC, OPDYKE GAS STATION INC, ORION FOOD STOP INC by Outlaw Laboratory, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Boss, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ORION FOOD STOP INC served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. HMA ENTERPRISES INC served on 11/30/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. OPDYKE GAS STATION INC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. YG & L CORP served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. LENOX OIL INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. KMA OIL INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Al-Hakim Corporation served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 4661 GAS & MORE INC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Boss, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER Extending time for Defendant YG & L Corp to file a responsive pleading, ( Response due by 1/23/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mahde Y. Abdallah on behalf of YG & L CORP. (Abdallah, Mahde)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron. (NAhm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
November 18, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Outlaw Laboratory, LP against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7489020 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 18-12497, Judge Robert H. Cleland] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boss, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outlaw Laboratory, LP v. OPDYKE GAS STATION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHLINE ACQUISITION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMA ENTERPRISES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Hakim Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMA OIL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENOX OIL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4661 GAS & MORE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YG & L CORP
Represented By: Mahde Y. Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPDYKE GAS STATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION FOOD STOP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SD OIL ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: Troy C. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outlaw Laboratory, LP
Represented By: Christopher W. Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?