FKA Distributing Company v. Urban Roots CBD LLC et al
Plaintiff: FKA Distributing Company
Defendant: Ella Essentials CBD LLC and Urban Roots CBD LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv10389
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (McManus, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2020 09:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (McManus, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Urban Roots CBD LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Cantor, Rebecca)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ella Essentials CBD LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Cantor, Rebecca)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Cantor on behalf of FKA Distributing Company. (Cantor, Mark)
February 13, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Urban Roots CBD LLC* (SOso)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Ella Essentials CBD LLC* (SOso)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Cantor, Rebecca)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FKA Distributing Company (Cantor, Rebecca)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement filed by FKA Distributing Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7602006 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Lenawee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - HoMedics Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit B - Defendants Trademark Application, #4 Exhibit C - 7/25/2019 Letter from HoMedics, #5 Exhibit D - 12/12/2019 Letter to HoMedics) (Cantor, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FKA Distributing Company v. Urban Roots CBD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FKA Distributing Company
Represented By: Rebecca J. Cantor
Represented By: Mark A. Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Essentials CBD LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Roots CBD LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?