Kirsch v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Kirsch
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv11930
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gordon James Kangas appearing on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company (Kangas, Gordon)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle Thurber Czapski appearing on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company (Czapski, Michelle)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Defendant to respond to the complaint, ( Response due by 9/21/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of Richard Kirsch. (Fink, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of Richard Kirsch. (Bressack, Darryl)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Mack, Jr on behalf of Richard Kirsch. (Mack, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Aspen American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Aspen U.S. Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Aspen (UK) Holdings Limited for Aspen American Insurance Company. (Blocker, Mark)
July 17, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT B - Affidavit in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Aspen American Insurance Company (O'Reilly, Rebecca)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aspen American Insurance Company from Wayne Count Circuit Court, case number 20-007332. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7931533 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-A State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 1-B State Court Register of Actions) (O'Reilly, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirsch v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca D. O'Reilly
Represented By: Gordon James Kangas
Represented By: Michelle Thurber Czapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kirsch
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: John L. Mack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?