Evans et al v. City of Ann Arbor et al
Plaintiff: Emily Evans and MELANIE WELCH
Defendant: Harry Ramsden, Tina Roperti, Craig S. Strong, Property Management Specialists, Inc., Dave Anderson, Judge Timothy Connors, Arbor Insulation, Rob McCrum, Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC, Esq. Brandon Wilson, Meadowlark Builders, LLC, Robert Patterson, David Giles, Esq. Matthew Krichbaum, Douglas Selby, City of Ann Arbor, Michigan Quality Electric, James Worthington, Kirk Brandon, Hon. Carol Kuhnke, Meadowlark Energy and Derek Tuck
Case Number: 3:2021cv10575
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #23 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC, Brandon Wilson., ( Response due by 5/28/2021) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to #23 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Supplement to Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs. (Susselman, Marc)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC, Brandon Wilson. (Brooks, Keefe)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Keefe A. Brooks on behalf of Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC, Brandon Wilson. (Brooks, Keefe)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer A. Richards appearing on behalf of City of Ann Arbor, Craig S. Strong, James Worthington (Richards, Jennifer)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy S. Wilhelm appearing on behalf of City of Ann Arbor, Craig S. Strong, James Worthington (Wilhelm, Timothy)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen K. Postema appearing on behalf of City of Ann Arbor, Craig S. Strong, James Worthington (Postema, Stephen)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Meadowlark Energy waiver sent on 4/17/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Vanneste, Mark)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kirk Brandon waiver sent on 4/17/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Vanneste, Mark)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Douglas Selby waiver sent on 4/17/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Vanneste, Mark)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Meadowlark Builders, LLC waiver sent on 4/17/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Vanneste, Mark)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC waiver sent on 4/17/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Vanneste, Mark)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying #11 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why an Injunction Should Not Enter Precluding Continuation of Proceedings in State Court - Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LBar)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brandon Wilson waiver sent on 4/13/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Wilson, Brandon)
April 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why An Injunction Should Not Enter Precluding Continuation of Proceedings In State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits with Exhibits 1-11, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 12-19) (Susselman, Marc)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B. Giordano on behalf of Timothy Connors, Carol Kuhnke. (Giordano, Caroline)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal H. Mithani on behalf of Timothy Connors, Carol Kuhnke. (Mithani, Sonal)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Matthew Krichbaum waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Susselman, Marc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Matthew Krichbaum identifying Corporate Parent Matthew Krichbaum for Matthew Krichbaum. (Wolock, Steven)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Wolock on behalf of Matthew Krichbaum. (Wolock, Steven)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Timothy Connors waiver sent on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021; Carol Kuhnke waiver sent on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Susselman, Marc)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. City of Ann Arbor waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021; Craig S. Strong waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021; James Worthington waiver sent on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Susselman, Marc)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8387656 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Washtenaw County Circuit Court, 2016-355-CK, Judge Timothy Connors] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits with Exhibits attached) (Susselman, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. City of Ann Arbor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Ramsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Roperti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig S. Strong
Represented By: Stephen K. Postema
Represented By: Timothy S. Wilhelm
Represented By: Jennifer A. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Management Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Timothy Connors
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Represented By: Sonal H. Mithani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Insulation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob McCrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard and Howard Attorneys, PLLC
Represented By: Keefe A. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Brandon Wilson
Represented By: Keefe A. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowlark Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Matthew Krichbaum
Represented By: Steven M. Wolock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Selby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ann Arbor
Represented By: Stephen K. Postema
Represented By: Timothy S. Wilhelm
Represented By: Jennifer A. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Quality Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Worthington
Represented By: Stephen K. Postema
Represented By: Timothy S. Wilhelm
Represented By: Jennifer A. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Carol Kuhnke
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Represented By: Sonal H. Mithani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowlark Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Tuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Evans
Represented By: Marc M. Susselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE WELCH
Represented By: Marc M. Susselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?