Pudney v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Brian R Pudney
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv10648
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Brian R Pudney served on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Spencer, Kerry)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Parrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Parrington, Kevin)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (NAhm)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (TTho)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Brian R Pudney. (Spencer, Kerry)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brian R Pudney against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Sanilac - County Where Action Arose: U.S. Government Defendant - County of 1st Defendant: U.S. Government Defendant. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Spencer, Kerry)
March 24, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pudney v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian R Pudney
Represented By: Kerry J. Spencer
Represented By: Kerry J Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kevin M. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?