Simpson et al v. Doe
Plaintiff: Laya Simpson, Sinn Da Truth LLC and Sinn da Truth
Defendant: John Doe, jayton, jaytondaboss, Jamil Jackson, onlyplugz and Jamail Jackson
Case Number: 3:2021cv10877
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Jamil Jackson * (NAhm)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Kerry, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jamil Jackson. (Kerry, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Document Continuation) (Kerry, Matthew)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *John Doe* (TTho)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Kerry, Matthew)
April 23, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for John Doe. (Kerry, Matthew)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *John Doe* (TTho)
April 20, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8431351 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Unknown. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Financial disclosure, #2 ao120, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Kerry, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jaytondaboss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamil Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: onlyplugz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamail Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laya Simpson
Represented By: Matthew Kerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinn Da Truth LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinn da Truth
Represented By: Matthew Kerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?