Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. PPA 300, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: PPA 300, LLC, Real Estate Service Solutions Company, LLC, Riverview Crossings, Riverview Crossing Apartments, Pennbrook Place Apartments, RESSCO, RESSCO Companies, SG Management, LLC and Shawn Douglas Stafford
Case Number: 3:2021cv12128
Filed: September 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Correction re #25 Protective Order. (LWag)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Scheduling Order Dates, ( Discovery due by 8/31/2022, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/30/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland, Jury Trial set for 1/17/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) (see order for additional dates) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) Modified on 4/19/2022 (LWag). (DOCUMENT ENTERED ON WRONG CASE)
February 7, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr: Settlement Conference held on 2/7/2022 Disposition: No settlement reached. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (MacKay, K)
February 6, 2022 RESET Hearings: Settlement Conference RESET for 2/7/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. *TIME CHANGE ONLY* (MacKay, K)
January 5, 2022 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth A. Downey appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs as co-counsel (Downey, Elizabeth)
January 5, 2022 Filing 23 RE-NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2022 AT 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. CONFERENCE WILL NOW BE HELD VIA ZOOM. CONNECTION INFORMATION TO BE EMAILED TO PARTIES OF RECORD. ALL DEADLINES REMAIN IN PLACE. (MacKay, K)
November 19, 2021 Filing 22 Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Kelley, Stephen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 Defendants and Counter-Plaintiffs' Preliminary WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Geller, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #9 Counterclaim, with Affirmative and Other Defenses, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kelley, Stephen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy Jr. SEE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE. (MacKay, K)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Ivy : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2022 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/27/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LWag)
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Real Estate Service Solutions Company, LLC (Geller, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PPA 300, LLC (Geller, Michael)
October 27, 2021 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 11/3/21 is Cancelled. Scheduling Order to Issue (LWag)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum) (Downey, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report REPORT filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Kelley, Stephen)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry J. Andries, Jr appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Andries, Henry)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 11:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 11:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF CONTRACT AND OTHER RELIEF filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit B-Letter dated April 27, 2021, #4 Exhibit C-Letter dated May 21, 2021, #5 Exhibit D-Determination of Damages and Costs, #6 Exhibit E-Notice of Nonrenewal of Insurance) (Geller, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants (Geller, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Geller, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael L. Geller appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Geller, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Kelley, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Shawn Douglas Stafford* (DPer)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Real Estate Service Solutions Company, LLC* (DPer)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *PPA 300, LLC* (DPer)
September 13, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Rescission, Breach of Contract, and Declaratory and Other Relief filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8611618 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit February 2020 Contract Excerpts, #3 Exhibit PPA 300, LLC Articles of Organization, #4 Exhibit 11-1-2018 RESSCO Press Release, #5 Exhibit RESSCO Website Properties List, #6 Exhibit 4-27-2021 Reservation of Rights Correspondence) (Kelley, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. PPA 300, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPA 300, LLC
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate Service Solutions Company, LLC
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview Crossings
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview Crossing Apartments
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennbrook Place Apartments
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESSCO
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESSCO Companies
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Management, LLC
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Douglas Stafford
Represented By: Henry J. Andries, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Kelley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?