Cequent Performance Products, Inc. v. Hopkins Manufacturing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cequent Performance Products, Inc.
Defendant: Hopkins Manufacturing Corporation and The Coast Distribution System, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv15293
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Komives
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Joint Motion to Amend Expert Discovery Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 76 and 80 Motion to Strike Portions of the Horenstein Report and Exclude Defendants' New Invalidity Grounds. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 68 and 70 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 70 SEALED MOTION to Compel and for In Camera Review. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION and ORDER Construing Disputed Claim Limitations. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Cequent Performance Products, Inc.'s 37 Motion to Lift Stay and Lifting Stay of Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendant's 30 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Reviews. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cequent Performance Products, Inc. v. Hopkins Manufacturing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cequent Performance Products, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Cavanagh - NOT SWORN
Represented By: David B. Cupar
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coast Distribution System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?