Counts et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Jason Counts, Donald Klein, Oscar Zamora, Brandon Stone, Jason Silveus, John Miskelly, Thomas Hayduk, Joshua Hurst and Joshua Rodriguez
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv12541
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Tuscola
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Opinion and Order Vacating 429 Show-Cause Order, Granting and Denying in Part Defendant GM's 345 , 346 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting and Denying in Part Defendant Bosch's 338 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 351 Motion to Enforce Scheduling Order. Supplemental Briefing for 337 , 338 , 344 , 345 , 346 Motions Due: (Responses due by 12/22/2020, Replies due by 1/14/2021). Motions terminated: 363 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Overruling Plaintiffs' 297 , 298 Objections to Magistrate Judge's 291 Order Permitting A 30(b)(1) Motion. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER Granting Defendants' 198 Motion to Compel Named Plaintiff Derek Long's Vehicle Inspection. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 274 Objections to Magistrate Judge's 259 Order Seal. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying Robert Bosch LLC's 108 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 82 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 6/15/2018.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting in Part Defendant's 37 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Denying Plaintiff's 36 MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order. (Discovery due by 3/30/2018, Settlement C onference set for 4/4/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/11/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington, Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington.), Motions terminated: 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct 28 Scheduling Order and 36 MOTION Modify the Scheduling Order re 28 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 22 Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER Granting In Part Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Counts et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Counts
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Klein
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Zamora
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Stone
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Silveus
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Miskelly
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hayduk
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hurst
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rodriguez
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?