Speech First, Inc. v. SCHLISSEL et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Speech First, Inc.
Defendant: MARK SCHLISSEL, E. ROYSTER HARPER, ERIK WESSEL, JULIO CARDONA, EDDIE L. WASHINGTON, JR., ROBERT SELLERS, MICHAEL J. BEHM, MARK J. BERNSTEIN, SHAUNA RYDER DIGGS, DENISE ILITCH, ANDREA FISCHER NEWMAN, ANDREW C. RICHNER, RON WEISER and KATHERINE E. WHITE
Case Number: 4:2018cv11451
Filed: May 8, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Flint Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Linda V. Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 27 Certificate of Service re 26 Notice of Appeal. (DWor)
August 13, 2018 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re 25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Receipt No: 0645-6856933 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Di Giacomo, John)
August 6, 2018 25 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2018 re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (RLou)
July 13, 2018 24 NOTICE OF HEARING on 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing RESET for 7/31/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker ***IN DETROIT - COURTROOM 602*** (RLou)
July 5, 2018 23 NOTICE OF HEARING on 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
June 29, 2018 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Harris, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2018 21 REPLY to Response re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Speech First, Inc.. (Di Giacomo, John)
June 19, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed 19 Motion to Stay Obligation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (The Deadline for Filing a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint is Extended Until Twenty-One (21) Days From the Date That the Court Rules on the Motion For Preliminary Injunction). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 18, 2018 19 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint,,, Unopposed Motion to Stay Obligation to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (McKinlay, Amy)
June 15, 2018 18 RESPONSE to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Baine and Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Evelyn Galvan, # 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of E. Royster Harper and Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit D.1 - Declaration of Laura Blake Jones and Exhibits 1-27, # 6 Exhibit D.2 - Declaration of Laura Blake Jones Exhibits 28-51, # 7 Exhibit D.3 - Declaration of Laura Blake Jones Exhibits 52-88, # 8 Exhibit E - Declaration of Erik Wessel and Exhibit) (McKinlay, Amy)
June 15, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy B. McKinlay on behalf of All Defendants. (McKinlay, Amy)
June 15, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hoover on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoover, Kathryn)
June 14, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Fuzesi on behalf of All Defendants. (Fuzesi, Stephen)
June 11, 2018 14 STATEMENT of Interest In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by United States (Caplan, Peter)
May 31, 2018 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Di Giacomo, John)
May 18, 2018 Featured Case TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part the 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Response to the 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is due by 6/15/2018, The Reply is due by 6/29/2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 17, 2018 12 REPLY to Response re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Dawson, Rian)
May 17, 2018 11 RESPONSE to 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Speech First, Inc.. (Di Giacomo, John)
May 17, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Baine on behalf of All Defendants. (Baine, Kevin)
May 16, 2018 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. (Dawson, Rian)
May 15, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Wenner on behalf of All Defendants. (Wenner, Adam)
May 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rian Cierra Dawson on behalf of All Defendants. (Dawson, Rian)
May 15, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard M. Niehoff on behalf of All Defendants. (Niehoff, Leonard)
May 15, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of All Defendants. (Huget, J.)
May 11, 2018 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Speech First, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicole Neily, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey Harris) (Di Giacomo, John)
May 8, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
May 8, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for *MICHAEL J. BEHM, MARK J. BERNSTEIN, JULIO CARDONA, SHAUNA RYDER DIGGS, E. ROYSTER HARPER, DENISE ILITCH, ANDREA FISCHER NEWMAN, ANDREW C. RICHNER, MARK SCHLISSEL, ROBERT SELLERS, EDDIE L. WASHINGTON, JR., RON WEISER, ERIK WESSEL, KATHERINE E. WHITE* (SKra)
May 8, 2018 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Di Giacomo, John)
May 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Speech First, Inc. against MICHAEL J. BEHM, MARK J. BERNSTEIN, JULIO CARDONA, SHAUNA RYDER DIGGS, E. ROYSTER HARPER, DENISE ILITCH, ANDREA FISCHER NEWMAN, ANDREW C. RICHNER, MARK SCHLISSEL, ROBERT SELLERS, EDDIE L. WASHINGTON, JR., RON WEISER, ERIK WESSEL, KATHERINE E. WHITE. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6723254 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Di Giacomo, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speech First, Inc. v. SCHLISSEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speech First, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Di Giacomo
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK SCHLISSEL
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. ROYSTER HARPER
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK WESSEL
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIO CARDONA
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDDIE L. WASHINGTON, JR.
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SELLERS
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. BEHM
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK J. BERNSTEIN
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAUNA RYDER DIGGS
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE ILITCH
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA FISCHER NEWMAN
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW C. RICHNER
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON WEISER
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE E. WHITE
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fuzesi
Represented By: Kathryn Hoover
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Amy B. McKinlay
Represented By: Leonard M. Niehoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?