Rayhaven Group, Inc. v. Rock Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rayhaven Group, Inc.
Defendant: Rock Industries, Inc. and Navigators Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv13176
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Navigators Insurance Company served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Herstein, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rayhaven Group, Inc. (Herstein, Matthew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Rock Industries, Inc.* (MacKay, K)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Navigators Insurance Company* (MacKay, K)
October 11, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (MacKay, K)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rayhaven Group, Inc. against Navigators Insurance Company, Rock Industries, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6942470 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Herstein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayhaven Group, Inc. v. Rock Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayhaven Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Herstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?