Sisson v. Charter County of Wayne et al

Plaintiff: Crystal Sisson
Defendant: Benny N. Napoleon, Theodis Sims, Sherri Tanner, Wayne County Sheriff's Department, Charter County of Wayne and Sheri Tanner
Case Number: 4:2018cv13766
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Original Incident Report, #2 Exhibit 2-36th District Court Ticket, #3 Exhibit 3-Vehicle Seizure Form, #4 Exhibit 4-Letter Releasing Vehicle, #5 Exhibit 5-36th District Court Register of Actions, #6 Exhibit 6-Transcript of 2.6.2019 Hearing in 36th District Ct) (Stella, Davidde)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crystal Sisson for Sheri Tanner and Theodis Sims. Both parties stipulate to extension of due date of all Defendants' answers to Friday, April 5, 2019. (Morris, Barton)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Sheri Tanner* (DWor)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Theodis Sims* (DWor)
March 6, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Theodis Sims, Sheri Tanner. (Morris, Barton)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Charter County of Wayne served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; Benny N. Napoleon served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Wayne County Sheriff's Department served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Return of Service - Benny Napoleon, #2 Document Continuation Return of Service - Wayne County Sheriff's Department) (Morris, Barton)
December 6, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Crystal Sisson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7016003 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Morris, Barton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisson v. Charter County of Wayne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny N. Napoleon
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodis Sims
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter County of Wayne
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Tanner
Represented By: Davidde A. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Sisson
Represented By: Barton W. Morris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?