Badeen et al v. PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America et al
Plaintiff: Midwest Recovery and Adjustment, Inc. and George badeen
Defendant: Renovo Services, LLC, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., The Huntington National Bank, Fifth Third Bank, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, Remarketing Solutions, LLC, PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America, PNC Bank, N.A. and TD Auto Finance, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv10532
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE held on April 18, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 46) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
April 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/18/2019. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Answer to 2nd Am. Complt by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Morant, Leslie)
April 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by K. Issac DeVyver on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (DeVyver, K.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathon Philip Reinisch appearing on behalf of PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America (Reinisch, Jonathon)
April 4, 2019 Filing 27 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TD Auto Finance, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toronto-Dominion Bank for TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Lund, Matthew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla L. Johnson on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Johnson, Karla)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midwest Recovery and Adjustment, Inc. (Xuereb, Joseph)
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Remarketing Solutions, LLC (Morant, Leslie)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Renovo Services, LLC (Morant, Leslie)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Second Amended Complaint) by Remarketing Solutions, LLC. (Morant, Leslie)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (second Amended Complaint) by Renovo Services, LLC. (Morant, Leslie)
March 7, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: IN PERSON Status Conference RESET for 4/18/2019 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to Provide a Statement of the Case. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO APPEAR: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **ALL PROCEEDINGS STAYED IN THIS MATTER PENDING IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE** (HMon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America identifying Corporate Parent ADESA, Inc., Corporate Parent KAR Auction Services, Inc. for PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America. (Kimrey, Blaine)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Gelbord on behalf of TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Gelbord, Brett)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Lund on behalf of TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Lund, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses [SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] by PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America. (Currie, Jessica)[ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT] Modified on 3/1/2019 (DPer).
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co, Ltd., Other Affiliate Renault S.A. for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Bruinsma, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James R. Bruinsma appearing on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Bruinsma, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathleen M. Ley-Bruinsma appearing on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Ley-Bruinsma, Kathleen)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Boettcher on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Boettcher, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Boettcher on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. (Boettcher, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Lannen on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Lannen, Patrick)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Lannen on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. (Lannen, Patrick)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna M. Boughton on behalf of Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Boughton, Shanna)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanah Park on behalf of PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America. (Park, Jeanah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine C. Kimrey on behalf of PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America. (Kimrey, Blaine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Brady on behalf of Fifth Third Bank. (Brady, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. Morant on behalf of Remarketing Solutions, LLC, Renovo Services, LLC. (Morant, Leslie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy)
February 22, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Jessica Vartanian Currie re #1 Notice of Removal,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America, Remarketing Solutions, LLC, Renovo Services, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 10-004053-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7119463 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings in the State Court Action, #3 Exhibit B - True and Correct Copy of Plaintiffs Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Answers to Defendant PAR, Inc.s Discovery Requests, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Discovery Requests to Forwarding Defendants) (Currie, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badeen et al v. PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Recovery and Adjustment, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Xuereb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George badeen
Represented By: Joseph M. Xuereb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renovo Services, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Represented By: Leslie C. Morant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Karla L. Johnson
Represented By: K. Issac DeVyver
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: Matthew J. Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Michael G. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Represented By: Kathleen M. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Leslie C. Morant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remarketing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Represented By: Leslie C. Morant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR, INC. d/b/a PAR North America
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Represented By: Jeanah Park
Represented By: Jonathon Philip Reinisch
Represented By: Blaine C. Kimrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: Matthew J. Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance, LLC
Represented By: Brett Gelbord
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?