Acantha LLC v. NuVasive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acantha LLC
Defendant: NuVasive, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv10656
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W. Caldwell on behalf of Acantha LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Stewart on behalf of Acantha LLC. (Stewart, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Acantha LLC (Young, Rodger)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for First Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint. Response due by 5/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M. Pellegrino on behalf of NuVasive, Inc.. (Pellegrino, Brandon)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Branigan on behalf of NuVasive, Inc.. (Branigan, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaye Quadrozzi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Quadrozzi, Jaye)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Young, Rodger)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *NuVasive, Inc.* (DWor)
March 13, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for NuVasive, Inc.. (Young, Rodger)
March 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Young, Rodger)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7136564 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - US Patent 6,261,291, #3 Exhibit B - US Reissued Patent 43,008, #4 Exhibit C - Exemplary Claim Chart) (Young, Rodger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acantha LLC v. NuVasive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acantha LLC
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Bradley W. Caldwell
Represented By: Christopher S. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuVasive, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Branigan
Represented By: Brandon M. Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?