Risveglia v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Olivia M Risveglia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv11073
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh J. Rappaport on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Rappaport, Hugh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ssa and us attorney general served on 06/19/2019. (Harthorn, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Olivia M Risveglia served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Harthorn, Steven)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (SSch)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
April 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (SOso)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Olivia M Risveglia. (Harthorn, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Olivia M Risveglia against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Harthorn, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risveglia v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Hugh J. Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia M Risveglia
Represented By: Steven V. Harthorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?