Prain et al v. National Heritage Academies, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: C Prain and Stephanie Prain
Defendant: Jorvonna Drain, National Heritage Academies, Incorporated, Kenturah Godfrey and Olivia Williamson
Case Number: 4:2019cv11103
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenturah Godfrey served on 5/26/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Roumel, Nicholas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Byrne on behalf of All Defendants. (Byrne, Jason)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Fielder on behalf of All Defendants. (Fielder, Amanda)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stephanie Prain against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Roumel, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda M. Ghannam appearing on behalf of C Prain, Stephanie Prain (Ghannam, Amanda)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. National Heritage Academies, Incorporated served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Roumel, Nicholas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jorvonna Drain served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Roumel, Nicholas)
April 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on behalf of C filed by Stephanie Prain against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7199847 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Roumel, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prain et al v. National Heritage Academies, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C Prain
Represented By: Amanda M. Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Prain
Represented By: Nicholas Roumel
Represented By: Amanda M. Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorvonna Drain
Represented By: Amanda M. Fielder
Represented By: Jason L. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Heritage Academies, Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda M. Fielder
Represented By: Jason L. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenturah Godfrey
Represented By: Amanda M. Fielder
Represented By: Jason L. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Williamson
Represented By: Amanda M. Fielder
Represented By: Jason L. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?