Genesis Attachments, LLC v. Detroit Edge Tool Company
Plaintiff: Genesis Attachments, LLC
Defendant: Detroit Edge Tool Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv11266
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Vartanian Currie on behalf of Detroit Edge Tool Company. (Currie, Jessica)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Genesis Attachments, LLC of Supplemental Corporate Disclosure (Cotter, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Genesis Attachments, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NPK Construction Equipment, Inc., Corporate Parent Nippon Pneumatic Mfg. Co. LTD for Genesis Attachments, LLC, Genesis Attachments, LLC. (Cotter, John)
June 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Cotter on behalf of Genesis Attachments, LLC. (Cotter, John)
June 10, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 6/13/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED VIA EMAIL TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Price, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Detroit Edge Tool Company. (Fitzpatrick, Adam)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keefe A. Brooks on behalf of Genesis Attachments, LLC. (Brooks, Keefe)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Price on behalf of Genesis Attachments, LLC. (Price, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:16-cv-00402. Modified on 5/1/2019 (VLun).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Michigan () Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/30/2019. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/1/2019.] Modified on 5/1/2019 (VLun).
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Genesis Attachments, LLC by Defendant Detroit Edge Tool Company. (Pliner, David) Modified on 8/23/2016. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/1/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/1/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDPATENT COMPLAINT against Detroit Edge Tool Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1825542.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # RE45,341, issued 01/20/2015, held by Genesis Attachments LLC, filed by Genesis Attachments, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Brochures, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Defendant Detroit Tool, #5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Gilbert, Glenna) Modified on 6/13/2016: Removed duplicate text and added exhibit descriptions. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:16-cv-00402.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Attachments, LLC v. Detroit Edge Tool Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Attachments, LLC
Represented By: John A. Cotter
Represented By: Michael T. Price
Represented By: Keefe A. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Edge Tool Company
Represented By: Franklin M. Smith
Represented By: Adam M. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Jessica Vartanian Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?