Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.112.62.167
Case Number: 4:2019cv11302
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Pseudonym for Defendant. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
May 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.112.62.167 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7226059 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 76.112.62.167
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?