Glover v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Demetrius Glover
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv11427
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 7/9/2019 is Cancelled re #5 Order to Attend Scheduling Conference. The Court will issue a scheduling order pursuant to the Joint Discovery Plan. (HMon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Griffin, Shelly)
June 25, 2019 Attorney Kevin Michael Washburn is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Leaving Firm. (Washburn, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin Michael Washburn appearing on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Washburn, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Griffin, Shelly)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Griffin, Shelly)
May 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-005331-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7239432 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Griffin, Shelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Glover
Represented By: Aaron J. Herskovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Shelly Lee Griffin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?