Bostick v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dennis Bostick
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv11761
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Berlin, Cary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE Defendant's Original and Amended Affirmative Defenses by Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Dennis Bostick of withdrawal of #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Feldman, Barry)
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/10/2019. Plaintiff to consider whether to move forward with pending motion for summary judgment. If motion not withdrawn by Plaintiff, Defendant to respond to the summary judgment motion by July 25, 2019. Plaintiff to reply by August 8, 2019. Court will not enter stay of discovery at this time. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (FIRST AMENDED) by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dennis Bostick. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Feldman, Barry)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Feldman on behalf of Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry)
June 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Fire & Casualty Company for State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-173876-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7282657 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Berlin, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostick v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Cary R. Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bostick
Represented By: Barry M. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?