Rogan v. Tomlinson
Plaintiff: Ryan Rogan
Defendant: Timothy Tomlinson and Roseville, City of
Case Number: 4:2019cv12975
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *Roseville, City of, Timothy Tomlinson* (DPer)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
November 7, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice of Correction, #10 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Ryan Rogan at 32510 Beechwood Dr., Warren, MI 48088. (HMon)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction re #8 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process. (HMon)
November 7, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause, #8 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process on Ryan Rogan at 32510 Beechwood Dr., Warren, MI 48088. (HMon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 [STRICKEN] Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process. (HMon) Modified on 11/7/2019 (HMon).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order (1) Vacating #4 Order to Show Cause and (2) Granting Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ryan Rogan against Timothy Tomlinson, Roseville, City of. (NAhm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order to Show Cause on Ryan Rogan at 32510 Beechwood, Sterling Heights, MI 48088. (HMon)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause or File an Amended Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Ryan Rogan. (NAhm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ryan Rogan against Timothy Tomlinson. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogan v. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?