Putrus v. KLINGER et al
Plaintiff: Alan Putrus
Defendant: Acting Dir. of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli, KEVIN K. McALEENAN, WILLIAM P BARR, Detroit Director USC Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj, Citizenship and Immigration Services, DHS USCIS Chicago Asylum Office District Director in his Official Capacity, MICHAEL KLINGER and Homeland Security, U.S. Dept. of
Case Number: 4:2019cv13146
Filed: October 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Repond to the #1 Complaint. Response due by 2/17/2020. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Anchill on behalf of All Defendants. (Anchill, Benjamin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Brikho, Sara)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DPer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
October 28, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alan Putrus against WILLIAM P BARR, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ken Cuccinelli, DHS USCIS Chicago Asylum Office District Director in his Official Capacity, Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj, Homeland Security, U.S. Dept. of, MICHAEL KLINGER, KEVIN K. McALEENAN. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7461180 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OAKLAND - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- I-797 Notice of Action, #3 Exhibit 2- USCIS Form N-652 Naturalization Interview Results, #4 Exhibit 3- Alan Putrus Michigan Drivers License, #5 Exhibit 4- Processing Time for Application for Naturalization (N-400) at Detroit MI as of October 23, 2019, #6 Exhibit 5- Asylum Approval Dated January 5, 2011, #7 Exhibit 6- Inquiry List, #8 Exhibit 7- I-551 Permanent Resident Card) (Brikho, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putrus v. KLINGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir. of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. McALEENAN
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Director USC Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS USCIS Chicago Asylum Office District Director in his Official Capacity
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KLINGER
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security, U.S. Dept. of
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Putrus
Represented By: Sara Brikho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?