Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Canadian National Railway et al
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Defendant: Grand Trunk Corporation and Canadian National Railway
Case Number: 4:2019cv13246
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Grand Trunk Corporation waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Brault, Darcie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Canadian National Railway waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Brault, Darcie)
November 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Corporation* (DAll)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Canadian National Railway* (DAll)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT against Canadian National Railway, Grand Trunk Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7472644 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Cook County, IL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brault, Darcie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Canadian National Railway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Darcie R. Brault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?