CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC. v. APTIV CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant: APTIV CORPORATION, APTIV PLC and DELPHI CORPORATION
Case Number: 4:2019cv13451
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint filed by CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC. against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Berger, Jay)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC. re #9 Order of Intent to File Second Amended Complaint (Berger, Jay)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Valiotis, D.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by APTIV CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by APTIV CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Aptiv PLC for APTIV CORPORATION. (Dawson, Rian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raymond W. Henney appearing on behalf of APTIV CORPORATION, APTIV PLC (Henney, Raymond)[APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF APTIV CORPORATION ONLY] Modified on 12/2/2019 (DPer).
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Peter Valiotis on behalf of CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Valiotis, D.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay M. Berger on behalf of CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Berger, Jay)
November 22, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Lamb on behalf of APTIV CORPORATION. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rian Cierra Dawson on behalf of APTIV CORPORATION. (Dawson, Rian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by APTIV CORPORATION from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-177505-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7497214 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Dawson, Rian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC. v. APTIV CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CT RESIDUAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Jay M. Berger
Represented By: D. Peter Valiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIV CORPORATION
Represented By: Rian Cierra Dawson
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Lamb
Represented By: Raymond W. Henney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIV PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELPHI CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?