Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc. v. United Steelworkers Local 13702
Plaintiff: Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc.
Defendant: United Steelworkers Local 13702
Case Number: 4:2019cv13741
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and other defenses by United Steelworkers Local 13702. (Adam, John)
January 31, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Robert H. Cleland to District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis pursuant to Administrative Order 20-AO-010. (SSch)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Israel on behalf of All Defendants. (Israel, Stuart)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending time for Defendant to file a response to the complaint, ( Response due by 2/6/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Taylor on behalf of Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc.. (Taylor, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Adam on behalf of United Steelworkers Local 13702. (Adam, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United Steelworkers Local 13702 served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
December 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *United Steelworkers Local 13702* (SOso)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Park Lawn Corporation for Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc. against United Steelworkers Local 13702. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7533951 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B - Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Sweitzer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc. v. United Steelworkers Local 13702
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Lawn Capital Limited, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie L. Sweitzer
Represented By: Michael K. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers Local 13702
Represented By: John G. Adam
Represented By: Stuart M. Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?