hansen et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: laura hansen, karen sobolak and richard sobolak
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 4:2020cv10438
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A.. (Galopin, Gary)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING #7 Answer (Free) filed by karen sobolak, laura hansen, richard sobolak. Document is prohibited discovery. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 [STRICKEN] [DOCUMENT TITLED:PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF SPECIFIC FRAUDULENT TRANSACTIONS INVOLVING BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.] ANSWER Per Court Order Dated 03/10/2020 by All Plaintiffs. (Roether, Robert) Modified on 3/23/2020 (LGra). Modified on 3/24/2020 (THal).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER Directing Defendant Bank of America to Produce Documents to Plaintiffs, Directing Plaintiffs to Identify Fraudulent Transactions, and to Extend the Time for Bank of America to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
February 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert H. Roether appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roether, Robert)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Amended Notice of Removal) (Galopin, Gary)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley M. Haladyna on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Haladyna, Kelley)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Turbiak on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Turbiak, Emily)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-012803-NZ. Receipt No: 0645-7608865 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings Filed in State Court) (Galopin, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: hansen et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Gary J. Galopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Kelley M. Haladyna
Represented By: Emily L. Turbiak
Represented By: Gary J. Galopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: laura hansen
Represented By: Robert H. Roether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: karen sobolak
Represented By: Robert H. Roether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: richard sobolak
Represented By: Robert H. Roether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?