DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC v. Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States et al
Plaintiff: DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, DB Entertainment, Inc., Vonch, LLC, The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Seventy7, LLC, Heritage Management Services, Inc., Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., MAG Entertainment, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Burch Management Company, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., Nitelife, Inc., 2740 Corporation, K-Kel, Inc., Platinum SJ Enterprise, Oasis on Essington, LTD, World Class Ventures, LLC, Club Cabaret, Inc., Ferney Properties, LLC, VC Lauderdale, Inc., Benelux Corporation, Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, L.C.M., LLC, Brookhurst Venture, LLC, City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., Saries Lounge, LLC, Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., Filosadelfia, LLC, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, King Bee, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, Peoria Speakeasy, Inc., Kimmico, Inc., JCB of Gainesville, Inc. and Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc.
Defendant: Treasury, Secretary of, Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States, United States of America and Small Business Administration, Administrator of
Intervenor Plaintiff: 689 Eatery Corp, GJJM Enterprises LLC and 725 Eatery Corp
Case Number: 4:2020cv10899
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:631
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #49 Amended Motion for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Zoom Status Conference held on 6/10/2020. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
June 5, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #49 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint) filed by All Defendants. (Gilligan, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM: Zoom Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THE CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE CONFERENCE** (HMon)
May 22, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of #40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Consent in Favor of #49 Corrected Motion for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint. (Hoffer, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 49 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Corrected Second Amended Compliant - With Verifications, Without Exhibits, #3 Exhibit B - Corrected Second Amended Complaint - Redline/Track Change Format) (Hoffer, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #44 Notice of Appeal filed by Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States, Small Business Administration, Administrator of, United States of America, Treasury, Secretary of [Appeal Case Number 20-1437] (SKra)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' #45 Emergency Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 13, 2020 Filing 46 Certificate of Service re #44 Notice of Appeal. (NAhm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 45 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #42 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Emergency Motion for Stay of the Court's May 11,2020, Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, or, in the Alternative, for a Thirty-Six Hour Extension of Time to Comply) by All Defendants. (Gilligan, James)
May 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Defendants re #42 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (Gilligan, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION by Verifying Second Amended Complaint re #41 Amended Complaint,, filed by Club Cabaret, Inc., Heritage Management Services, Inc., Kimmico, Inc., MAG Entertainment, LLC, Oasis on Essington, LTD, Peoria Speakeasy, Inc., Vonch, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Verification as to MAG Entertainment, LLC and Oasis on Essington, LTD, #3 Exhibit B - Verification as to Club Cabaret, Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Verification as to Heritage Management Services, inc., #5 Exhibit D - Verification as to Kimmico, Inc., #6 Exhibit E - Verification as to Peoria Speakeasy, Inc., #7 Exhibit F - Verification as to Vonch, LLC) (Hoffer, Matthew)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' #12 and #23 Motions for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 10, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PPP Provisions of the CARES Act, #3 Exhibit B - SBA 3245-AH34, #4 Exhibit C - 60 Fed. Reg. 64356 et seq., #5 Exhibit D - 13 C.F.R 120.110, #6 Exhibit E - SBA Standard Operating Procedure 50 10 5(K), #7 Exhibit F - Exemplar SBA PPP Loan Application, #8 Exhibit G - Lender PPP Supplemental Information Form, #9 Exhibit H - DV's SBA PPP Borrower Application, #10 Exhibit I - Lender Denial to BDS, DB, Millennium, T&N and Burch, #11 Exhibit J - Lender Denial to Ferny Properties) (Hoffer, Matthew)
May 10, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Consent by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Hoffer, Matthew)
May 6, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Garrell, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2020 re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 2740 Corporation, Burch Management Company, Inc., L.C.M., LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Nitelife, Inc., DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Benelux Corporation, JCB of Gainesville, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Seventy7, LLC, Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Filosadelfia, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Brookhurst Venture, LLC, Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Saries Lounge, LLC, Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., DB Entertainment, Inc. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
May 4, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by All Defendants Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Attachment (7th Cir. Stay Order)) (Gilligan, James)
May 4, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING on #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . ZOOM Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THE HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE HEARING** (HMon)
May 1, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Order in Camelot Banquet) (Edinger, Gary)
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by All Defendants of Supplement Authority (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (Gilligan, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 33 Bench Order rendered at a hearing held on 4/30/2020 before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Granting #22 Motion to Intervene. (TEXT-ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED) (HMon)
April 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2020 re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 2740 Corporation, Burch Management Company, Inc., L.C.M., LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Nitelife, Inc., DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Benelux Corporation, JCB of Gainesville, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Seventy7, LLC, Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Filosadelfia, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Brookhurst Venture, LLC, Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Saries Lounge, LLC, Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., DB Entertainment, Inc. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. ECF # 22 - Motion to Intervene Granted. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #30 Second MOTION to Seal #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 2740 Corporation, Burch Management Company, Inc., L.C.M., LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Nitelife, Inc., DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Benelux Corporation, JCB of Gainesville, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Seventy7, LLC, Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Filosadelfia, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Brookhurst Venture, LLC, Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Saries Lounge, LLC, Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., DB Entertainment, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 29, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Re Potential Discovery Dispute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of 30b6 Deposition of SBA Representative, #2 Exhibit B - SBA Objections to Notice of 30b6 Deposition) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 31 SEALED EXHIBIT Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibits re #30 Second MOTION to Seal #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Lender Denial to Non-Party, #2 Exhibit E - SBA EMail to Lender of Non-Party, #3 Exhibit F - Denial Letter to JCB of Gainesville, Inc.) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Filing 30 Second MOTION to Seal #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Lender Denial to Non-Party, #2 Exhibit E - SBA Email to Lender of Non-Party, #3 Exhibit F - Denial Letter to JCB of Gainesville, Inc.) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #29 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #28 Reply to Response to Reviewed Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by 2740 Corporation, Burch Management Company, Inc., L.C.M., LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Nitelife, Inc., DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Benelux Corporation, JCB of Gainesville, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Seventy7, LLC, Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Filosadelfia, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Brookhurst Venture, LLC, Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Saries Lounge, LLC, Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., DB Entertainment, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (re: Defendants' Brief in Oppostiion to Plaintiffs Renewed Emergency Motion fo rTemporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) filed by Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States, Small Business Administration, Administrator of, United States of America, Treasury, Secretary of. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #26 MOTION to Seal filed by 2740 Corporation, Burch Management Company, Inc., L.C.M., LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Nitelife, Inc., DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., Rialto Pockets, Inc., City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., MAG Pitt LP, W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Benelux Corporation, JCB of Gainesville, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Seventy7, LLC, Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., BDS Restaurant, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Washington Management, LLC, Stone Park Entertainment, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Filosadelfia, LLC, Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc., Polmour, Inc., MAG Enterprises, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., Brookhurst Venture, LLC, Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, T and N Incorporated, Saries Lounge, LLC, Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., DB Entertainment, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 27, 2020 Filing 29 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #28 Reply to Response to Reviewed Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit P - Article re PPP Loan to Brothel, #3 Exhibit Q - SBA RIN 3245-AH34, #4 Exhibit R - SBA RIN 3245-AH35, #5 Exhibit S - SBA RIN 3245-AH36, #6 Exhibit T - CARES Act 1102 Lender Agreement) (Shafer, Bradley)
April 26, 2020 Filing 27 SEALED EXHIBIT Notice of Filing Unredacted Exhibits per E.D. Mich. LR 5.3(b)(3)(B)(iii) re #26 MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Hoffer - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Byrne - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Polakis - Unredacted) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 26, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Hoffer - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Byrne - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Polakis - Redacted) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 24, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (re: Defendants' Brief in Oppostiion to Plaintiffs Renewed Emergency Motion fo rTemporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) by All Defendants. (Gilligan, James)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (SBA, Standard Operating Procedure, Lender & Dev. Co. Loan Programs) (excerpts), #2 Exhibit 2 (SBA, Interim Final Rule, Business Loan Program Temporary Changes; Paycheck Protection Program)) (Gilligan, James)
April 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 689 Eatery Corp, 725 Eatery Corp, GJJM Enterprises LLC. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene by 689 Eatery Corp, 725 Eatery Corp, GJJM Enterprises LLC. (Kinsley, Jennifer)
April 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E Garrell on behalf of Brookhurst Venture, LLC, City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc., Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc., High Expectations Hospitality, LLC, Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc., K-Kel, Inc., Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC, L.C.M., LLC, Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc., Nitelife, Inc., Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc., PNM Enterprises, Inc., Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC, Platinum SJ Enterprise, Rialto Pockets, Inc., Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc., Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc., Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc., Saries Lounge, LLC, Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc., The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc., The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc., W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC, Washington Management, LLC, World Class Ventures, LLC. (Garrell, Peter)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S Edinger on behalf of JCB of Gainesville, Inc., VC Lauderdale, Inc.. (Edinger, Gary)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING BY ZOOM on #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. ZOOM Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE ZOOM LINK THAT WILL BE PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO PARTICIPATE IN THE HEARING** (HMon)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' #12 Renewed Emergency MOTION for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/20/2020. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Renewed Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 19, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Renewed Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction #12 by All Plaintiffs. (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 18, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits re #12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order RenewedRenewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - SBA Brief with Highlighting, #2 Exhibit O - Email Chain with Bank Post-TRO) (Shafer, Bradley)
April 18, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION by Athanases Stamatopoulos re #11 Amended Complaint,, Verification of First Amended Complaint filed by Benelux Corporation (Attachments: #1 Verification of First Amended Complaint) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 18, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley J. Shafer appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shafer, Bradley)
April 17, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew J. Hoffer re #11 Amended Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY ZOOM: Status Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM. PLEASE USE THE LINK PROVIDED BY THE COURT TO JOIN THE CONFERENCE** (HMon)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Renewed, Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PPP Provisions of the CARES Act, #3 Exhibit B - SBA 3245, #4 Exhibit C - Congress Members' Letter to SBA Administrator Jovita Carranza and Secretary of the Treasury Steven Mnuchin, #5 Exhibit D - Order Granting TRO in Sister Case: Camelot Banquet Rooms v. SBA et al., #6 Exhibit E - List of Plaintiffs Denied PPP Benefits, #7 Exhibit F - House Committee on Small Business Letter to Secretary of the Treasury Steven Mnuchin and SBA Administrator Jovita Carranza, #8 Exhibit G - House Committee on Agriculture Letter to SBA Administrator Jovita Carranza, #9 Exhibit H - 60 Fed. Reg. 64356 et seq., #10 Exhibit I - 13 C.F.R 120.110, #11 Exhibit J - SBA Standard Operating Procedure 50 10 5(K), #12 Exhibit K - DVs SBA Paycheck Protection Program Borrower Application, Form 2483, #13 Exhibit L - Sample Bank Paycheck Protection Program Supplemental Information Form, #14 Exhibit M - PPP Loan Denial Letter to DB Entertainment) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PPP Provisions of the CARES Act, #3 Exhibit B - SBA 3245, #4 Exhibit C - 60 Fed. Reg. 64356 et seq., #5 Exhibit D - 13 C.F.R 120.110, #6 Exhibit E - SBA Standard Operating Procedure 50 10 5(K), #7 Exhibit F - Exemplar SBA PPP Loan Application, #8 Exhibit G - Lender, #9 Exhibit H - DV's SBA PPP Borrower Application, #10 Exhibit I - Lender Denial to BDS, DB, Millennium, T&N and Burch) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Caplan on behalf of Small Business Administration, Administrator of, Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States, Treasury, Secretary of, United States of America. (Caplan, Peter)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of All Defendants. (Gilligan, James)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC of withdrawal of #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction . (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/9/2020. Plaintiff to withdraw emergency motion without prejudice. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (AChu)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/9/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. See notice for conference information. (AChu)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PPP provisions of the CARES Act, #3 Exhibit B - SBA 3245, #4 Exhibit C - 60 Fed. Reg. 64356, #5 Exhibit D - 13 C.F.R 120.110, #6 Exhibit E - SBA Standard Operating Procedures, #7 Exhibit F - SBA PPP Application of Plaintiff DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC, #8 Exhibit G - Hancock Whitney Bank PPP Supplemental Information Form) (Shafer, Bradley)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley J. Shafer appearing on behalf of DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC (Shafer, Bradley)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction by DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC. (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 8, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SOso)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED filed by DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7729439 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - PPP provisions of the CARES Act, #3 Exhibit B - SBA Interim Final Rule 3245, #4 Exhibit C - 60 Fed. Reg. 64356, #5 Exhibit D - 13 C.F.R. 120.110, #6 Exhibit E - SOP - Abridged, #7 Exhibit F - SBA PPP Application - Exemplar Copy, #8 Exhibit G - Hancock Whitney Bank PPP Supplemental Information Form - Exemplar, #9 Exhibit H - SBA PPP Application - Plaintiff DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC) (Hoffer, Matthew)
April 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Hoffer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC v. Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury, Secretary of
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration, an agency of the United States
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration, Administrator of
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DV Diamond Club of Flint, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn Ave Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonch, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Oxnard Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Park Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Expectations Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seventy7, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmdale Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAG Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T and N Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Maria Restaurant Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAG Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Spearmint Rhino Adult Superstore, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Spearmint Rhino Companies Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burch Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rialto Pockets, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitelife, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2740 Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K-Kel, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platinum SJ Enterprise
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oasis on Essington, LTD
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Class Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Cabaret, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferney Properties, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VC Lauderdale, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Represented By: Gary S Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benelux Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midnight Sun Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Restaurant Venture I, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Hospitality Venture, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.M., LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookhurst Venture, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Industry Hospitality Venture, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saries Lounge, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Restaurants Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BDS Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filosadelfia, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.P.B. Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Bee, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Management, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Barbara Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rouge Gentlemens Club, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spearmint Rhino Consulting Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNM Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polmour, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAG Pitt LP
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoria Speakeasy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimmico, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JCB of Gainesville, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Represented By: Gary S Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olympic Avenue Venture, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hoffer
Represented By: Bradley J. Shafer
Represented By: Peter E Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: 689 Eatery Corp
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: GJJM Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: 725 Eatery Corp
Represented By: Jennifer M Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?