Gregorio v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Eric Gregorio, John Walker, Joseph Plis, Christopher Wooten, Brandon Lemons, Esq Steven G Calamusa, Garrett Daniel, Tyrone Morrow, Robert Escudero, Dylon Zimmerli, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne and Evan Dickson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv11310
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Shalina D Kumar
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Lindsay DeMoss. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Lindsay DeMoss by Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney William Kalas by All Plaintiffs. (Hughes, Emily)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2022. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shacara V. Mapp) (Number of Pages: 61) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2023. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Mapp, Shacara)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #60 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MLan)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2022 re #60 MOTION to Compel filed by Garrett Daniel, Brandon Lemons, Robert Escudero, Tyrone Morrow, Brendon Shunk, Evan Dickson, John Walker, Steven G Calamusa, Eric Gregorio, Steven Swayne, Joseph Plis, Dylon Zimmerli Disposition: Motion granted in part, denied in part. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (MLan)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY to Response re #60 MOTION to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information filed by Steven G Calamusa, Garrett Daniel, Evan Dickson, Robert Escudero, Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Tyrone Morrow, Joseph Plis, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne, John Walker, Dylon Zimmerli. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email Chain Between the Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 2 - Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE OF TIMES CHANGE as to #60 MOTION to Compel. Zoom Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611888040?pwd=MUkzSDVHeEFYWkNVUmtlb0J0NmRGdz09 Passcode: 208961|. (MLan)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for reply as to #60 Motion to Compel: Reply due by 11/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MLan)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to #60 MOTION to Compel filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhits, #2 Exhibit 1 - December 17, 2021 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Corr. from 1/28/22, 2/25/22 & 3/2/22 re search terms, #4 Exhibit 3 - March 3, 2022 Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - June 17, 2022 Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - July 18, 2022 Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - August 19, 2022 Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Ford's October 27, 2022 Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - Ford's Supplemental Initial Disclosures of 7/22/21, #10 Exhibit 9 - October 3, 2022 Email, #11 Exhibit 10 - Order Denying Pltf's MTC, Weidman V. FMC, 2:18-cv-12719-GAD-EAS, #12 Exhibit 11 - Unpublished cases) (Corpus, Kathleen)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULING ORDER DATES, ( Discovery due by 3/29/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/13/2024). Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. [Refer to image for additional deadlines]. (THal)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evan Dickson, Tyrone Morrow, Joseph Plis, Steven Swayne as to Joseph Plis (individually, and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individual), Steven Swayne, Evan Dickson and Tyrone Morrow (Miller, E.)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #60 MOTION to Compel . Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click this URL to join. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611888040?pwd=MUkzSDVHeEFYWkNVUmtlb0J0NmRGdz09 Passcode: 208961| (EBut)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY: On September 13, 2022, the Court held a telephonic status conference with counsel on plaintiffs motion to compel (ECF No. 60). As discussed, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith to resolve or narrow the issues raised in plaintiffs motion. In the event they are unable to resolve the motion, defendants response shall be due on October 28, 2022. If necessary, the Court will hold oral argument by Zoom on November 18, 2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Mary Novacheck. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Mary Novacheck for on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Novacheck, Mary)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Referring Discovery to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand re #60 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Compel by Steven G Calamusa, Garrett Daniel, Evan Dickson, Robert Escudero, Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Tyrone Morrow, Joseph Plis, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne, John Walker, Dylon Zimmerli. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- 6.3.21 Letter to Defense Counsel re Fords Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B- 6.4.21 Letter from Ford responding to 6.3.21 Letter, #4 Exhibit C- 8.4.21 Letter to Defense Counsel re ESI Protocol, #5 Exhibit D- 8.21.21 J. Alperstein Letter, #6 Exhibit E- 10.27.21 Letter to J. Sanders re Discovery, #7 Exhibit F- 3.30.22 Correspondence re Discovery, #8 Exhibit G- 4.5.22 Response to Plaintiffs Meet and Confer Letter, #9 Exhibit H- 6.6.22 Letter to Ford re Hearing and Discovery disputes, #10 Exhibit I- 6.13.22 Response to Plaintiffs Meet and Confer Letter, #11 Exhibit J- Plaintiffs First Set of Request for Production, #12 Exhibit K- Fords Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production, #13 Exhibit L- Ponzio v. Mercedes, Case No. 18-cv-12544 (D.N.J.), Transcript, #14 Exhibit M- Fords Initial Disclosures, #15 Exhibit N- In re Mercedes-Benz Emissions Litig., No. 2:16-cv-881 (SDW)(JAD) (D.N.J.) (ECF No. 244, Oct. 4, 2019), #16 Exhibit O- Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference held on 7/20/2022. Order of Referral of all Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Grand to be entered. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/20/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar (THal)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference held on 6/14/2022. A status conference will be set for July 20, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. via Zoom. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of withdrawal of #54 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of the Claims of Plaintiff John Walker . (Douglas, Stephanie)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff John Walker to Respond to #54 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of the Claims of Plaintiff John Walker :( Response due by 5/25/2022). Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Black on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Black, John)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Status Conference reset for 6/14/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar (THal)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of the Claims of Plaintiff John Walker by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Buyer's Order, Agreement and Vehicle Information Form, #2 Exhibit B - Purchase Agreement) (Douglas, Stephanie)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Status Conference set for 5/24/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar (THal)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/6/2022. An IN PERSON Status Conference will be set for 5/24/2022 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Monthly Status Conference set for 4/6/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. The parties are to use the call-in information contained in this Notice. (THal)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULING ORDER, ( Fact Discovery due by 11/29/2022, Dispositive Motion Cut-off reset for 10/13/2023). [Refer to image for additional dates]. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Wooten as to Christopher Wooten (individually, and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individual) Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal (Miller, E.)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Feeney on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Feeney, James)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Shalina D. Kumar pursuant to Administrative Order 22-AO-004. (SSch)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Attorney Grant A. Newman Grant A. Newman by Ford Motor Company. (Newman, Grant)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company Affidavit of Personal Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Ford Motor Credit Company (Douglas, Stephanie)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/6/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoff Stahl on behalf of Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Tyrone Morrow, Joseph Plis, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne, John Walker, Christopher Wooten, Dylon Zimmerli. (Stahl, Geoff)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Discovery Status Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathleen S. Corpus appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Corpus, Kathleen)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dana Fraser, I appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fraser, Dana)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ellen Goolsby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Goolsby, Laura)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Bentley on behalf of Garrett Daniel, Evan Dickson, Robert Escudero, Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Tyrone Morrow, Joseph Plis, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne, John Walker, Christopher Wooten, Dylon Zimmerli. (Bentley, Rachel)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Laura E. Bieniek by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: GRANTING #39 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Laura E. Bieniek. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Notice of Screening (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Steven R. Weinmann. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Steve R. Weinmann by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 7/7/2021 is Cancelled. (EPar)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Status Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Fact Discovery due by 4/29/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EPar)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Production of Hard Copy Documents and Electronically Stored Information. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay DeMoss Long on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Long, Lindsay)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laura E. Bieniek appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bieniek, Laura)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/29/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EPar)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/13/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EKar)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Newman, Grant)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Novacheck on behalf of All Defendants. (Novacheck, Mary)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Douglas, Stephanie)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Answer Complaint.(Response due by 3/22/2021) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 . Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Sandusky, K)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority regarding pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. #22 ) is granted. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Sandusky, K)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Douglas, Stephanie)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Henry Alperstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Alperstein, Jason)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Kalas appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kalas, William)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily E. Hughes appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hughes, Emily)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Joseph Plis, John Walker, Christopher Wooten, Garrett Daniel, Tyrone Morrow, Robert Escudero, Dylon Zimmerli, Brendon Shunk, Steven Swayne, Evan Dickson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: E. Powell Miller appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, E.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis A. Lienhardt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lienhardt, Dennis)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss Briefing. (Response due by 10/16/2020, and Reply due by 11/6/2020) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bases of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Factual Allegations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Model Years 2014-2019 Ford Warranty Guides, #5 Exhibit 5 - DeCoteau Class Action Complaint Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2019 Mustang Owner's Manual Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 7 - April 8, 2020 Letter from Tarek H. Zohdy, #8 Exhibit 8 - May 7, 2020 Letter from Justin H. Sanders) (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Increasing Page Limitation. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (THIRD) filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Weinmann, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Calamusa on behalf of Steven G Calamusa. (Calamusa, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Third Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Increasing Page Limitation. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant A. Newman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Newman, Grant)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-09773.
May 26, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Central District of California. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON STIPULATION 42 TO STAY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE AND TRANSFER THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 & 1406 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS THEREFORE STIPULATED AND AGREED that, subject to the Court's approval, this action be transferred to the United Stated District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 5/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Ford Motor Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition 34 , filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Wooten, Eric Gregorio, Brandon Lemons, Joseph Plis, John Walker(Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Eric Gregorio(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Brandon Lemons(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party John Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Joseph Plis(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Christopher Wooten(pty:pla))(Weinmann, Steven) [Transferred from cacd on 5/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Weinmann, Steven) [Transferred from cacd on 5/26/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24783785 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Ziad El-Rifai (pty:pla))(Weinmann, Steven) [Transferred from California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-09773.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregorio v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gregorio
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Plis
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wooten
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lemons
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esq Steven G Calamusa
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Steven G. Calamusa
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Daniel
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Morrow
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Escudero
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylon Zimmerli
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Shunk
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Swayne
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Geoff Stahl
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Dickson
Represented By: Dana Fraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Laura E. Bieniek
Represented By: Laura Ellen Goolsby
Represented By: Rachel Bentley
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Derek J. Linkous
Represented By: Grant A. Newman
Represented By: James P. Feeney
Represented By: John David Black
Represented By: Kathleen S. Corpus
Represented By: Lindsay DeMoss Long
Represented By: Mary Novacheck
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth Demoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?