Stanford Dental, PLLC v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stanford Dental, PLLC
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. and Citizens Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv11384
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle M. Asher on behalf of Citizens Insurance Company of America, The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (Asher, Kyle)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Citizens Insurance Company of America, The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Executive Order 2020-21, #3 Exhibit 2 - DIFS Screen Shot, #4 Exhibit 3 - Gavrilides Hr'g Transcript, #5 Exhibit 4 - Social Life Magazine Hr'g Tr) (McAllister, Lori)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M. McAllister on behalf of Citizens Insurance Company of America, The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (McAllister, Lori)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Response due by 7/22/2020. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Citizens Insurance Company of America served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. McKenney on behalf of Stanford Dental, PLLC. (McKenney, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Grieco on behalf of Stanford Dental, PLLC. (Grieco, Jennifer)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth F. Neuman on behalf of Stanford Dental, PLLC. (Neuman, Kenneth)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Citizens Insurance Company of America* (LGra)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Sickels on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sickels, Robert)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Jason)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.* (LGra)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 [ENTERED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *Stanford Dental, PLLC* (LGra) Modified on 6/1/2020 (LGra).
June 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7832309 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1A - CICA Property Insurance Policy Number 07B-8692082, #3 Exhibit 1B - CICA Policy Endorsement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Hanover Insurance Group Denial May 7, 2020 Denial Letter, #5 Exhibit 3 - July 6, 2006 Insurance Services Office Circular) (Kochanowski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Dental, PLLC v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Dental, PLLC
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Stephen T. McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle M. Asher
Represented By: Lori M. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kyle M. Asher
Represented By: Lori M. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?