Blasingame v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christina Russo Blasingame
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv12558
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Christina Russo Blasingame (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Only) (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Christina Russo Blasingame (Settlement Between Plaintiff and Co-Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Only) (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Christina Russo Blasingame to Show Cause why this case should not be transferred to the Western District of Michigan. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Joseph, James)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating #13 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters Excluding Dispositive Motions to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
October 15, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr pursuant to Administrative Order 20-AO-049. (SSch)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Huse on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Huse, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Rang on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Rang, Laura)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trans Union LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions, Inc served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters Excluding Dispositive Motions to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Trans Union LLC* (DPer)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Equifax Information Services, LLC* (DPer)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Experian Information Solutions, Inc* (DPer)
September 18, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christina Russo Blasingame against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8055026 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Reyna, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blasingame v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: James P. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Represented By: William M. Huse
Represented By: Laura K. Rang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Russo Blasingame
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?