Caring Dentistry, P.C. et al v. Miecyjak et al
Plaintiff: Caring Dentistry, P.C. and Caring Dentistry of Sterling Heights, P.C.
Defendant: Peter Miecyjak and JP Morgan Chase Bank (N.A.)
Case Number: 4:2021cv10261
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Oakland County Circuit Court of receipt of #4 Notice of remand. (DPer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE remanding case to OAKLAND COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATED ORDER REMANDING CASE to Oakland County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
February 12, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Peter Miecyjak* (DAll)
February 11, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Peter Miecyjak. (Lebow, Michael)
February 5, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JP Morgan Chase Bank (N.A.) from Circuit Court for the County of Oakland, case number 20-184859-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8317806 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint in Circuit Court of Oakland County, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint) (Haladyna, Kelley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caring Dentistry, P.C. et al v. Miecyjak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Miecyjak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank (N.A.)
Represented By: Kelley M. Haladyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caring Dentistry, P.C.
Represented By: Michael J. Lebow
Represented By: Ira S. Auslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caring Dentistry of Sterling Heights, P.C.
Represented By: Michael J. Lebow
Represented By: Ira S. Auslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?