Brown v. Haider et al
Case Number: 4:2021cv11565
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 72 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Renewed Summary Judgment Motion and Lifting Stay of Proceedings. (Renewed Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/20/2024.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER (1) Conditionally Appointing Counsel for Limited Representation in Settlement Negotiations and (2) Staying Case for 120 Days. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER (1) Adopting Recommended Disposition of 45 Report and Recommendation and (2) Granting Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Haider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?