Vail v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Patricia A Vail
Defendant: Commissioner and Social Security, Commissioner of
Case Number: 4:2021cv11783
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security. (Clayton, Kenneth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 08/10/2021. (Clayton, Kenneth)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Richards on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Richards, Jessica)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of served on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Clayton, Kenneth)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Social Security, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General* (DPer)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (DPer)
August 4, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia A Vail against Commissioner. Plaintiff requests summons issued. FEE PD:AMIEDC-8562586. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Clayton, Kenneth) Modified on 8/3/2021 (DAll).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vail v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Vail
Represented By: Kenneth D. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Represented By: Jessica Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?