Schaeffler Group USA Inc. v. BorgWarner Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Schaeffler Group USA Inc.
Defendant: BorgWarner Inc., BorgWarner Ithaca LLC Doing business as BorgWarner Morse Systems and BorgWarner Emissions Systems (Ningbo) Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv11883
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by BorgWarner Emissions Systems (Ningbo) Co. Ltd., BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, BorgWarner Inc. Answer due: 12/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J. Worrel appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Worrel, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by All Defendants. (Hulliberger, Kristopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristopher K. Hulliberger appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Hulliberger, Kristopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank C. Cimino, Jr on behalf of Schaeffler Group USA Inc.. (Cimino, Frank)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BorgWarner Ithaca LLC served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Dorsky, Jason)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BorgWarner Inc. served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Dorsky, Jason)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds in Detroit to District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis in Flint. (SSch)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *BorgWarner Emissions Systems (Ningbo) Co. Ltd.* (DPer)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *BorgWarner Ithaca LLC* (DPer)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *BorgWarner Inc.* (DPer)
August 16, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Dorsky on behalf of Schaeffler Group USA Inc.. (Dorsky, Jason)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Oliver, Justin)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Schaeffler Group USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schaeffler AG for Schaeffler Group USA Inc.. (Oliver, Justin)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Schaeffler Group USA Inc. against BorgWarner Emissions Systems (Ningbo) Co. Ltd., BorgWarner Inc., BorgWarner Ithaca LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8577251 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:20-cv-10928-TGB-MJH, Judge Judge Terrence G. Berg] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - U.S. Patent No. 7,389,756, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Excerpts from BorgWarner Inc. 2020 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - BorgWarner 4/23/2018 Press Release, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Excerpt from 1/1/2017 BorgWarner Hourly Employees Flexible Benefits Plan, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Excerpt from Dec. 29, 2020 Romeo Power, Inc. Schedule 13D, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Tauber Institute for Global Operations, BorgWarner Morse Systems, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - BorgWarner 12/17/2012 Press Release, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - BorgWarner 1/13/2015 Press Release, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - GM Parts Store, Part No. 12698402, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - GM Parts Store, Part No. 12703758, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Claim Charts) (Oliver, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaeffler Group USA Inc. v. BorgWarner Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schaeffler Group USA Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Dorsky
Represented By: Justin J Oliver
Represented By: Frank C. Cimino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Worrel
Represented By: Kristopher K. Hulliberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Ithaca LLC Doing business as BorgWarner Morse Systems
Represented By: Christopher J. Worrel
Represented By: Kristopher K. Hulliberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Emissions Systems (Ningbo) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher J. Worrel
Represented By: Kristopher K. Hulliberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?