Securities and Exchange Commission v. Biogenic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Susann Ashley Cargnino, Zachari Alan Cargnino, Julie Ann Youssef, Gary Youssef, Biogenic, Inc., Diagnostic Link Ltd, LLC, Vital Systems Ltd LLC, BioTek Holdings LLC, Tek Wellness LLC, Susann Ashley Walker, Ashley Walker, Zach Alan, Julie Ann, Julie Joseph, Capital Care Management LLC and Gary Joseph
Case Number: 4:2021cv12236
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Fishman, Steven)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Gary Youssef. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Julie Youssef. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment As to Liability Against Julie Youssef and Gary Youssef filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Zachari Alan Cargnino waiver sent on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Fishman, Steven)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Susann Ashley Cargnino waiver sent on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Fishman, Steven)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Harrison appearing on behalf of Gary Youssef, Julie Ann Youssef (Harrison, Michael)
September 24, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven F. Fishman appearing on behalf of BioTek Holdings LLC Diagnostic Link Ltd LLC, Vital Systems Ltd LLC, BioTek Holdings LLC, Tek Wellness Inc., Capital Care Management LLC, Susann Cargnino, Zachari Cargnino (Fishman, Steven)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment As to Liability Against Julie Youssef and Gary Youssef by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment Julie Youssef, #2 Exhibit Proposed Judgment Gary Youssef, #3 Exhibit Signed Consent - Julie Youssef, #4 Exhibit Signed Consent - Gary Youssef) (Schultz, Christian)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Lenawee - County of 1st Defendant: Lenawee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schultz, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Biogenic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susann Ashley Cargnino
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachari Alan Cargnino
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ann Youssef
Represented By: Michael J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Youssef
Represented By: Michael J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biogenic, Inc.
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diagnostic Link Ltd, LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Systems Ltd LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioTek Holdings LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tek Wellness LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susann Ashley Walker
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Walker
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Alan
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Ann
Represented By: Michael J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Joseph
Represented By: Michael J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Care Management LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Joseph
Represented By: Michael J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christian Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?