Orozco et al v. FCA US, LLC
Plaintiff: Domingo Orozco, Irma Orozco, Mark Bordelon and Antoine Louvat
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv12823
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Complaint.Response due by 2/11/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (King, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Azar, Thomas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US, LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US, LLC* (TTho)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8710421 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Orange County, FL - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Alperstein, Jason)
December 3, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco et al v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Orozco
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Orozco
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bordelon
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Louvat
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?