Simer v. Oakland County et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Simer
Defendant: Oakland County, Adam Lowe, Mark Garey, Nicholas Talierico and Nicholas Cherry
Case Number: 4:2022cv10020
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Curtis Ivy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN DEADLINE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. The parties are to use the call-in information provided in this Notice. (RLou)
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 Answer to Complaint Response to Affirmative Defenses by Patrick Simer. (DeRouin, Amy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Potter, Steven)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Layla Rose Sizemore appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Sizemore, Layla)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER changing the Nature of Suit code. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (DPer)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Responsive Pleading Date: Responsive pleading due by 2/26/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Trevor S. Potter appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Potter, Trevor)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert C. Clark appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Robert)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven M. Potter appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Potter, Steven)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Arnold Abent on behalf of Patrick Simer. (Abent, Jonathan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oakland County served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (DeRouin, Amy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicholas Talierico served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (DeRouin, Amy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mark Garey served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (DeRouin, Amy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Adam Lowe served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (DeRouin, Amy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicholas Cherry served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (DeRouin, Amy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Nicholas Cherry, Mark Garey, Adam Lowe, Oakland County, Nicholas Talierico* (SKra)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Simer against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8742786 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Trainor, Christopher)
January 5, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simer v. Oakland County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Simer
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Represented By: Amy J. DeRouin
Represented By: Jonathan Arnold Abent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Lowe
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garey
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Talierico
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Cherry
Represented By: Layla Rose Sizemore
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Trevor S. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?