Dimensional Certification, Inc. v. Axis Mechanical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dimensional Certification, Inc.
Defendant: Axis Mechanical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv12864
Filed: November 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Rule 26(f) Meeting and Setting Date for Initial Rule 16 Conference. TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. *SEE NOTICE FOR DIAL IN INFORMATION* Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT and REFERENCE to a United States Magistrate Judge to Conduct All Proceedings. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (SSch)
December 28, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Scheduling Conference on 1/5/2023 is Cancelled. (EPar)
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by Dimensional Certification, Inc. . (Berke, Mark)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy R. Schupp appearing on behalf of Axis Mechanical Group, Inc. (Schupp, Timothy)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (EPar)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Axis Mechanical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit) (Krause, Courtney)
November 28, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
November 25, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Axis Mechanical Group, Inc. (Krause, Courtney)
November 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Axis Mechanical Group, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-011574-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9141812 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Krause, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimensional Certification, Inc. v. Axis Mechanical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimensional Certification, Inc.
Represented By: Mark B. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Mechanical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney A. Krause
Represented By: Timothy R. Schupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?