Johnson Chambers v. Michigan First Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Johnson Chambers
Defendant: Michigan First Credit Union, Jeff Fitrzyk, Jennifer Borowy, Sarah Ries Clarke, Faith Hollowell, Doe 1, Market Value Property Specialists, Mark Reling and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2023cv10730
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Shalina D Kumar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DIRECTED AT PLAINTIFF REGARDING SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FAITH HOLLOWELL - Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2023 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
May 22, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 Order to Show Cause on Yolanda Johnson Chambers at 14574 Ruthland St., Detroit MI 48227 (CCie)
May 8, 2023 Filing 17 [WRONG EVENT SELECTED, DOCUMENT IS A REPLY TO #15 MOTION TO REMAND] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #16 Reply to Response to Motion To Remand filed by Michigan First Credit Union. (Krempa, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2023 (TTho).
May 2, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Michigan First Credit Union. (Krempa, Michael)[ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANTS JEFF FITRZYK, JENNIFER BOROWY, AND SARAH RIES CLARKE] Modified on 5/2/2023 (DPer).
April 27, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Yolanda Johnson Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D-F and H-M, #4 Exhibit G)[submitted through pro se portal] (SSch)
April 26, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT Concurrence in Relief Sought filed by Market Value Property Specialists, Mark Reling. (Wrobel, Kenneth)
April 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Correction re 12 Notice to Appear - ***DOCUMENT WAS FILED ON THE INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** (CCie)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT - (CCie)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
April 26, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument on Yolanda Johnson Chambers at 14574 Ruthland St., Detroit MI 48227 (CCie)
April 26, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Yolanda Johnson Chambers, 14574 Ruthland St., Detroit MI 48227 (THal)
April 26, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Notice of Correction on Yolanda Johnson Chambers at 14574 Ruthland St., Detroit MI 48227 (CCie)
April 20, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Yolanda Johnson Chambers. [Submitted through pro se portal] (SSch)
April 20, 2023 Filing 8 EXHIBITS by Yolanda Johnson Chambers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit I, K, L, M, N and Prov Agt, #3 Exhibit P - S and Collab Agr)[Submitted through pro se portal] (SSch) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2023: #4 Exhibit R) (SSch).
April 6, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Market Value Property Specialists, Mark Reling. (Wrobel, Kenneth)
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT by Michigan First Credit Union (Krempa, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss VERIFIED COMPLAINT by Michigan First Credit Union. (Krempa, Michael)[MOTION TO DISMISS ALSO ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FITRZYK, BOROWY, CLARKE] Modified on 3/30/2023 (JOwe).
March 30, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kenneth J Wrobel, Jr appearing on behalf of Market Value Property Specialists, Mark Reling (Wrobel, Kenneth)
March 29, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles Holzman appearing on behalf of Michigan First Credit Union (Holzman, Charles) [ATTORNEY APPEARANCE ALSO ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FITRZYK, BOROWY, CLARKE] Modified on 3/30/2023 (JOwe).
March 29, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael V. Krempa appearing on behalf of Michigan First Credit Union [ATTORNEY APPEARANCE ALSO ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FITRZYK, BOROWY, CLARKE] (Krempa, Michael) Modified on 3/30/2023 (JOwe).
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michigan First Credit Union from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 23-002391-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9292299 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Krempa, Michael)
March 29, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Chambers v. Michigan First Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Johnson Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan First Credit Union
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Fitrzyk
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Borowy
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Ries Clarke
Represented By: Charles Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Market Value Property Specialists
Represented By: Kenneth J Wrobel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Reling
Represented By: Kenneth J Wrobel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?