Alarayshi et al v. US Secretary of State et al
Plaintiff: Zacharia A Alarayshi, Laila K Alarayshi, Arab American Anti Discrimination Committee and Arab Civil Rights League
Defendant: Anthony Blinken, Lloyd Austin, US Secretary of State and US Secretary of Defense
Case Number: 4:2023cv12599
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Shalina D Kumar
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
November 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Ayad, Nabih)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BY THREE DAYS re #19 MOTION to Dismiss. ( Response due by 11/9/2023, Reply due by 11/16/2023). Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Response due by 11/6/2023; Reply due by 11/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (KMac)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Response due by 11/6/2023; Reply due by 11/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (KMac)
October 24, 2023 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference held on 10/24/2023. The Court will issue a briefing schedule for Defendants' pending motion to dismiss. Counsel for plaintiff will provide counsel for defendants and Chambers staff with information regarding related cases filed in other federal district courts. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KMac)
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Emergency First Amended Complaint for Mandamus with Request for Injunctive Relief by All Defendants. (Kossak, Jonathan)
October 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference with counsel set for 10/24/2023 04:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
October 19, 2023 *CORRECTED* Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference with counsel held on 10/19/2023. A video status conference with counsel to be set for October 24, 2023* at 4:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
October 19, 2023 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference with counsel held on 10/19/2023. A video status conference with counsel to be set for October 24, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/19/2023 03:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar (THal)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Writ of Mandamus Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Allen, James)
October 17, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Allen, James)
October 17, 2023 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Status Conference held on 10/17/2023. A second status conference was set with the parties for Thursday, October 19th, 2023 at 3:00pm and will be held via video conference. The Court will accept ECF No. 13 as the government's response to both ECF Nos. 10 and 16. Defendants will not need to refile. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
October 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/17/2023 01:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar (THal)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Kossak, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of All Defendants. (Lin, Jean)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak on behalf of All Defendants. (Kossak, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Allen, James)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION by James P. Allen Sr re #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs (Allen, James)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 RE-ISSUED SUMMONS Issued for *US Secretary of Defense, US Secretary of State*, United States Attorney, and Office of the Attorney General (DJen) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/16/2023) (DJen).
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DJen)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *US Secretary of Defense, US Secretary of State* (DJen)
October 16, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DJen)
October 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nabih H. Ayad on behalf of Arab Civil Rights League. (Ayad, Nabih)
October 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Savage on behalf of Arab Civil Rights League. (Savage, William)
October 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Savage on behalf of Zacharia A Alarayshi. (Savage, William)
October 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nabih H. Ayad on behalf of Zacharia A Alarayshi. (Ayad, Nabih)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9525105 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: USA - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Emergency Motion) (Allen, James)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On October 13, 2023, plaintiffs Zacharia and Laila Alarayshi filed an emergency complaint for mandamus with request for injunctive relief with an attached emergency motion for a temporary restraining order [ECF No. 1] against defendants Anthony Blinken, U.S. Secretary of State and Lloyd Austin, U.S. Secretary of Defense. Though plaintiffs have fashioned the motion as one for ex parte relief, it appears that the filing does not fully comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B), which requires an attorney affidavit certifying its efforts to give notice to defendants and stating the reasons why notice should be excused. Plaintiffs affidavits do not indicate any effort to notify defendants of their motion. Therefore, plaintiffs must serve their motion on defendants, confer with defendants' attorneys, and notify the Court of the parties' earliest availability to participate in a telephonic status conference with the Court. If plaintiffs are unable to serve and confer with defendants' attorneys by October 17, 2023, plaintiffs may supplement their motion with an amended attorney certification to fully comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B). Issued by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (KMac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alarayshi et al v. US Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacharia A Alarayshi
Represented By: James P. Allen
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Represented By: William D. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila K Alarayshi
Represented By: James P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arab American Anti Discrimination Committee
Represented By: James P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arab Civil Rights League
Represented By: James P. Allen
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Represented By: William D. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Secretary of State
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Secretary of Defense
Represented By: Jean Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D Kossak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?